Williams v. State of Illinois
Plaintiff: Willie Williams
Defendant: State of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2021cv02475
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Fee Notice (lma, )
June 8, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff has filed a financial affidavit in support of a motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. No separate motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis appears on the docket, so the Court construes the financial affidavit to include the motion. A federal court may permit a party to proceed on appeal without prepayment of fees provided that the party is indigent and the appeal is taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) & (3); Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Although Plaintiff's financial affidavit is not fully completed, he attests that he is 69 years old, is unemployed, and receives approximately $875.00 per month from social security. His annualized income is therefore approximately $10,500.00 per year. Although he fails to list any expenses on his financial affidavit, assuming he has any (and he must), then he qualifies as indigent. To determine that an appeal is taken in good faith, a court need only find that a reasonable person could suppose that the appeal has some merit. See Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626, 632 (7th Cir. 2000) (citing Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025, 1026 (7th Cir. 2000)). The Court found Plaintiff's claim that he is Howard Hughes's nephew and is entitled to an inheritance from the state of Illinois to be fantastical and frivolous. Although Plaintiff does not state the grounds for his appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1)(C), the Court finds that an appeal from its ruling would be without merit. Accordingly, the Court denies Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this order to the Court of Appeals. Mailed notice. (kp, )
June 8, 2021 FORWARDED copy of document #18 to the USCA. (kp, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Willie Williams accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. (gw, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 16 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Fee Notice (bg, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #12 ; USCA Case No. 21-2000 (bg, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #12 . Notified counsel. (bg, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #12 (bg, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of appeal by Willie Williams regarding orders #9 , #8 (bg, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER from Willie Williams dated 5/26/2021. (bg, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Willie Williams not dated. (exr, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (kp, )
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/12/2021. Mailed notice. (kp, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Willie Williams. (rc, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Willie Williams for attorney representation. (rc, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Willie Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (rc, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (rc, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by Willie Williams. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?