Guenther v. Harley-Davidson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Guenther
Defendant: Harley-Davidson, Inc., Bosch Brake Components LLC, Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02479
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kathleen Guenther by Christopher Michael Norem (Norem, Christopher)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Defendant Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC by Mark A. Kircher (Kircher, Mark)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC (Zolfo, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC against Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC . by Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC(Zolfo, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC by Michael Gerald Zolfo (Zolfo, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, Law Division, case number (2021L3269) filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18310764. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Zolfo, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kathleen Guenther, Counter Defendant Kathleen Guenther by Dennis M. Lynch (Lynch, Dennis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Bosch Brake Components LLC, Robert Bosch LLC against Kathleen Guenther . by Bosch Brake Components LLC, Robert Bosch LLC(OConnell, David)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to Dennis M. Lynch (daj, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bosch Brake Components LLC, Robert Bosch LLC (OConnell, David)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bosch Brake Components LLC, Robert Bosch LLC by Jennifer L. Rediehs (Rediehs, Jennifer)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bosch Brake Components LLC, Robert Bosch LLC by David John OConnell (OConnell, David)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (OConnell, David)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021 L 003269) filed by Bosch Brake Components LLC, Robert Bosch LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18221927. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(OConnell, David)
May 7, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guenther v. Harley-Davidson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosch Brake Components LLC
Represented By: David John OConnell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Rediehs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Co., LLC
Represented By: Michael Gerald Zolfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: David John OConnell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Rediehs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Guenther
Represented By: Dennis M. Lynch
Represented By: Christopher Michael Norem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?