J.P. Morgan Securities LLC et al v. Cresset Asset Management, LLC
Petitioner: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Respondent: Cresset Asset Management, LLC and Cresset Wealth Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02497
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Beth W Jantz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION by Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC to expedite ruling on Respondent's Request to Stay Briefing on Rule 12(b)(6) Issues (Griesmeyer, Christopher)
June 25, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction subject matterMOTION by Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC to stay briefing on enforcement motion #14 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Leonard Weintraub in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Stay)(Hickman, Corey)
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Respondent's motion to modify briefing schedule #17 is granted. The briefing schedule previously set on Petitioner's motion to enforce an arbitral subpoena #9 is stricken, to be reset if necessary, following the District Judge's adjudication of Respondent's pending motion to dismiss #14 .Mailed notice (sxw, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Given the briefing schedule, R. 16, the previously set tracking status hearing of 06/18/2021 for Judge Chang is vacated (the 08/06/2021 tracking status hearing remains in place). Emailed notice (mw, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC to set a briefing schedule on Dkt. 4 after ruling on Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 14) (Griesmeyer, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Respondent's motion #14 to dismiss, given the nature of the motion, the district judge will decide it. The Petitioner's response is due by 06/25/2021. The Respondent's reply is due by 07/09/2021. To track the case only (no appearance is required), a tracking status hearing is set for 08/06/2021 at 8:30 a.m. Emailed notice (mw, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Cresset Asset Management, LLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, motion to stay #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CSG Dec Part 1, #2 Exhibit CSG Dec Part 2)(Griesmeyer, Christopher)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction subject matter, MOTION by Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC to stay briefing on enforcement motion (Griesmeyer, Christopher)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC by Christopher Scott Griesmeyer (Griesmeyer, Christopher)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cresset Asset Management, LLC (Griesmeyer, Christopher)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC by Zachary Mulcrone (Mulcrone, Zachary)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to Cresset Asset Management, LLC on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Hickman, Corey)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Petitioners' motion to enforce an arbitral subpoena #4 has been referred to the Magistrate Judge. The motion is taken under advisement. The docket does not yet reflect notice of the action has been given to Respondent. To allow adequate time, therefore, Respondent's response to the motion is due 6/28/21. Petitioners' reply is due 7/12/21. Petitioners are directed to promptly serve a copy of this order on counsel for Respondent. (rbf, )
May 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Respondent Cresset Asset Management, LLC (crl, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Beth W. Jantz for motion #4. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/11/2021. (ec, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioners J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., by Jenny R. Goltz (Goltz, Jenny)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The motion #4 to enforce subpoena in the arbitration is referred to the magistrate judge. The referral will be processed with the Executive Committee. To track the case only for Judge Chang (no appearance is required), a tracking status hearing is set for 06/18/2021 at 8:30 a.m. Emailed notice (mw, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., in support of motion to enforce #4 a Subpoena Issued In An Arbitration (Hickman, Corey)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Petitioners J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., to enforce a Subpoena Issued in Arbitration (Hickman, Corey)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hickman, Corey)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioners J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., by Corey Thomas Hickman (Hickman, Corey)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - PETITION TO ENFORCE A SUBPOENA ISSUED IN ARBITRATION filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18226921. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Hickman, Corey)
May 10, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC et al v. Cresset Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cresset Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Scott Griesmeyer
Represented By: Zachary Mulcrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cresset Wealth Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Scott Griesmeyer
Represented By: Zachary Mulcrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Represented By: Jenny R. Goltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Represented By: Jenny R. Goltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?