Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center et al v. Village of Olympia Fields et al
Plaintiff: Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center, All Nations Assembly Church, Inc. and Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC doing business as Roseheart Renewal Center
Defendant: Village of Olympia Fields Plan Commission, Village of Olympia Fields and Village of Olympia Fields Board of Trustees
Case Number: 1:2021cv02505
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The parties' joint motion to reset status hearing and extend deadlines #13 is granted. Defendants shall have until 8/5/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The telephonic initial status hearing set for 7/15/2021 is stricken and reset for 8/12/2021 at 10:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC for extension of time (Joint Motion) (Liguori, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by 7/16/2021. Mailed notice (dal, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Defendants re MOTION by Defendants Village of Olympia Fields, Village of Olympia Fields Board of Trustees, Village of Olympia Fields Plan Commission for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 #10 (Lemley, Brandon)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Village of Olympia Fields, Village of Olympia Fields Board of Trustees, Village of Olympia Fields Plan Commission for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Lemley, Brandon)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Village of Olympia Fields, Village of Olympia Fields Board of Trustees, Village of Olympia Fields Plan Commission by Brandon K Lemley (Lemley, Brandon)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 7/15/2021 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff All Nations Assembly Church, Inc. by Carmen David Caruso (Caruso, Carmen)
May 11, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Village of Olympia Fields, Village of Olympia Fields Board of Trustees, Village of Olympia Fields Plan Commission (crl, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center by Brian C Haussmann (Haussmann, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center by Caesar A. Tabet (Tabet, Caesar)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center by Jordan E. Wilkow (Wilkow, Jordan)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center by Christopher David Liguori (Liguori, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Liguori, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18227884. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Vol. 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Vol. 2 of 2))(Liguori, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center et al v. Village of Olympia Fields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Olympia Fields Plan Commission
Represented By: Brandon K Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Olympia Fields
Represented By: Brandon K Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Olympia Fields Board of Trustees
Represented By: Brandon K Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC d/b/a RoseHeart Renewal Center
Represented By: Brian C Haussmann
Represented By: Christopher David Liguori
Represented By: Caesar A. Tabet
Represented By: Jordan E. Wilkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Nations Assembly Church, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recovery & Rehabilitation, LLC doing business as Roseheart Renewal Center
Represented By: Brian C Haussmann
Represented By: Caesar A. Tabet
Represented By: Jordan E. Wilkow
Represented By: Christopher David Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?