Chunyu v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified in Schedule A
Plaintiff: Lianghao Chunyu
Defendant: THE PARTNERSHIPS and UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A" and The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified in Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2021cv02516
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 EXHIBIT (mc, )
July 7, 2021 BOND in the amount of $5,000.00 cashier's check, Receipt No. 4624258815, posted by Lianghao Chunyu. (lxk, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/6/2021: Telephonic status hearing held on 7/6/2021. Plaintiff's oral motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to extend the Temporary Restraining Order entered on 6/22/2021 #13 for an additional fourteen days until 7/20/2021. The extension is necessary to allow adequate time for Plaintiff to execute the Temporary Restraining Order and accomplish service on Defendants. Plaintiff shall deposit with the Court five-thousand dollars ($5,000.00), by cashier's check or other certified funds, as security, which amount was determined adequate for the payment of such damages as any person may be entitled to recover as a result of a wrongful restraint under the Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic status hearing set for 7/20/2021 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 *SEALED* TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/22/2021. Mailed notice (dal, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 6/22/2021. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. The Temporary Restraining Order shall be maintained under seal until further order of the Court. The Temporary Restraining Order is entered effective 11:30 a.m. on 6/22/2020 and shall expire in fourteen (14) days. Telephonic status hearing set for 7/6/2021 at 10:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Due to the Courthouse closure for the Juneteenth holiday, the telephonic status hearing set for 6/18/2021 is stricken and reset for 6/22/2021 at 11:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lianghao Chunyu by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's motions for leave to file under seal #2 and its ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order #5 , including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery. Having considered the submission in chambers, the Court rules as follows. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #2 is granted. The Clerk is directed to maintain the following documents under seal until further order of this Court: (1) Schedule A to the Complaint #3 , and (2) Exhibit 1 to the temporary restraining order memorandum #7 . Only Plaintiff's counsel and Court staff shall have access to these documents. With respect to Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery, the Court finds that Plaintiff has satisfied the requirements for the requested relief, without written or oral notice to the adverse parties, as provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b). Accordingly, the motion is granted subject to the Court's review of Plaintiff's proposed Temporary Restraining Order and plan for service on Defendants, neither of which was included in Plaintiff's submission. By Friday, 6/4/2021, Plaintiff shall (1) submit a proposed Temporary Restraining Order in Word format to Proposed_Order_Wood@ilnd.uscourts.gov, and (2) file a supplemental report or motion setting forth its plan for service on Defendants. Telephonic motion hearing set for 6/3/2021 is stricken. Telephonic status hearing set for 6/18/2021 at 10:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Hao Ni for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #5 , motion for leave to file #2 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/3/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Ni, Hao)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Lianghao Chunyu Ex. 2 - Defendant Stores (Ni, Hao)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Lianghao Chunyu in support of motion for temporary restraining order #5 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chunyu - Ex 1)(Ni, Hao)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Lianghao Chunyu for temporary restraining order (Ni, Hao)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mc, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Lianghao Chunyu Schedule A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ni, Hao)
May 11, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Lianghao Chunyu for leave to file under seal (Ni, Hao)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lianghao Chunyu ; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18229632. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Schedule A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chunyu v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified in Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lianghao Chunyu
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: David Randolph Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PARTNERSHIPS and UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified in Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?