Wilson v. Carl Buddig And Company
Plaintiff: Quan Wilson
Defendant: Carl Buddig And Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv02527
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The Clerk is directed to issue alias summons for service on Defendant Carl Buddig and Company. The Clerk is directed to send the Marshals Service the alias summons as well as the USM-285 form 7 already submitted by Plaintiff.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 30, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued along with USM 285 form(s), certified copy of order dated 06/30/2021 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendant Carl Buddig And Company via email. (rc, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:It does not appear from the docket that summons has been served. Accordingly, the status hearing set for 6/29/2021 #8 is stricken and re-set for 7/22/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis. Motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has not made sufficient efforts to find an attorney on his own. Also, it is too early in the case to determine whether Plaintiff is able to litigate this case on his own. See Pickett v. CTA, 930 F.3d 869, 871 (7th Cir. 2019); Romanelli v. Suliene, 615 F.3d 847, 852 (7th Cir. 2010). The Marshals Service is appointed to serve summons 6 and the complaint #1 on Defendant using the USM-285 form already submitted 7 by Plaintiff. Status hearing set for 6/29/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Quan Wilson. (rc, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Quan Wilson for attorney representation. (rc, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Quan Wilson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (rc, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (rc, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by Quan Wilson. (Exhibits) (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Carl Buddig And Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Buddig And Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?