Rodriguez v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Enrique Rodriguez
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv02553
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed with prejudice as to Plaintiff's claims, and without prejudice as to the claims of the putative class, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending dates before this court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) (Barnow, Ben)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A Notice of Settlement has been filed. All pending deadlines in this case are stricken. A joint status report on settlement is due by 6/24/2022, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed before then. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Settlement by Enrique Rodriguez (Barnow, Ben)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Enrique Rodriguez against Ford Motor Company (Barnow, Ben)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file an amended complaint #29 is granted. Plaintiff is to file their amended complaint as a separate entry on the docket. The defendants is to answer or otherwise plead by 5/25/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM motion for leave to file #29 by Enrique Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Barnow, Ben)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Enrique Rodriguez for leave to file Amended Complaint (Barnow, Ben)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, Ford's motion to dismiss, R. #11 , is granted and Rodriguez's claims are dismissed without prejudice. If Rodriguez believes he can cure the deficiencies described in this opinion, Rodriguez may not immediately file an amended complaint. Rather, he may file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The motion should be accompanied by a redlined proposed amended complaint and a brief of no more than five pages explaining how the amendments cure the deficiencies identified in this opinion. Any such motion must be filed by April 22, 2022. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/31/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, Ford's motion to stay discovery, R. #20 , is granted. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/9/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY by Defendant Ford Motor Company in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Adkins, Tammy)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY by Ford Motor Company to MOTION by Defendant Ford Motor Company to stay discovery pending ruling on motion to dismiss #20 , response to motion #24 (Adkins, Tammy)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE by Enrique Rodriguez to MOTION by Defendant Ford Motor Company to stay discovery pending ruling on motion to dismiss #20 (Barnow, Ben)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE by Enrique Rodriguezin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ford Motor Company #11 (Barnow, Ben)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties have agreed to the following briefing schedule, which the Court adopts, on the motion to stay #20 : Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Ford's motion or to file an Amended Complaint is 8/19/2021; Ford's deadline to reply or file a response to an Amended Complaint is 8/26/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of motion to stay #20 discovery pending ruling on motion to dismiss (Adkins, Tammy)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Ford Motor Company to stay discovery pending ruling on motion to dismiss (Adkins, Tammy)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS Report (JOINT) by Enrique Rodriguez (Barnow, Ben)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties have agreed to the following briefing schedule on the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 : Plaintiff's response is due by 8/17/2021; Defendant's reply is due by 9/7/2021. Unopposed motion for extension of time to file #17 is granted. The joint status report deadline is extended to 8/4/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Ford Motor Company for extension of time to file Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report (Adkins, Tammy)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Enrique Rodriguez by Robert Ahdoot (Ahdoot, Robert)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Enrique Rodriguez by Christopher E. Stiner (Stiner, Christopher)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Enrique Rodriguez by Andrew W Ferich (Ferich, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ford Motor Company (Adkins, Tammy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 (Adkins, Tammy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Adkins, Tammy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ford Motor Company by Tammy L. Adkins (Adkins, Tammy)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ford Motor Company (dxb, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #6 #7 #8 are granted. Attorneys Robert Ahdoot, Andrew W. Ferich, and Christopher E. Stiner for Enrique Rodriguez added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18257682. (Stiner, Christopher)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18257651. (Ferich, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18257587. (Ahdoot, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 7/21/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Enrique Rodriguez by Anthony L Parkhill (Parkhill, Anthony)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Enrique Rodriguez by Ben Barnow (Barnow, Ben)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barnow, Ben)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Enrique Rodriguez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18234849.(Barnow, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Tammy L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Rodriguez
Represented By: Anthony L Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Represented By: Christopher E. Stiner
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?