Reed v. Headline Solar LLC
Plaintiff: Arthur Reed
Defendant: HEADLINE SOLAR LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02559
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Arthur Reed for entry of default (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Martoccio, Gary)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Reed as to Headline Solar LLC on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (Martoccio, Gary)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 7/13/2021 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/6/2021. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 17, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Headline Solar LLC (cm, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Arthur Reed (Martoccio, Gary)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arthur Reed by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Arthur Reed; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18236064. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary)
May 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Headline Solar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEADLINE SOLAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Reed
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?