Flaherty v. Boots Retail USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norah Flaherty
Defendant: Boots Retail USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02759
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report. Motion to dismiss original complaint is terminated as moot #18 based on filing of amended complaint. Response to amended complaint, which is expected to be a motion to dismiss, is to be filed by 8/12/2021; response to motion to dismiss is to be filed by 9/9/2021; reply to response is to be filed by 9/23/2021. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are to be made by 8/19/2021. The telephone status hearing set for 7/13/2021 is vacated and reset to 8/24/2021 at 9:10 AM. The following call in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. The Court will consider setting a further discovery schedule at that time. (mk)
July 9, 2021 Filing 25 STATUS Report by Norah Flaherty (Perry, Steven)
June 24, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED complaint by Norah Flaherty against Boots Retail USA, Inc. (Perry, Steven)
June 5, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Emily A. Weiser to appear pro hac vice #22 is granted. (mk)
June 4, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18319871. (Weiser, Emily)
June 3, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 6/3/2021. Defendant's motion to dismiss #18 is entered and continued. Plaintiff has until 6/24/2021 to file an amended complaint. A telephonic status hearing is set for 7/13/2021 at 9:20 a.m. The following call in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. By no later than 7/9/2021, the parties are directed to file a joint status report that shall include the following information: (1) a very short description of each party's claims and defenses; (2) details regarding any discussions about settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; and (3) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule. Mailed notice. (mma, )
May 29, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: A telephonic status hearing is set for 6/3/2021 at 9:30 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Plaintiff's counsel should be prepared to advise the Court whether plaintiff, having seen defendant's motion to dismiss, wishes to amend her complaint or respond to the motion. (mk)
May 28, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Boots Retail USA, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 (Wasserman, Renee)
May 28, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Boots Retail USA, Inc. and/or Strike Allegations From The First Amended Complaint (Wasserman, Renee)
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boots Retail USA, Inc. by Alecia E Cotton (Cotton, Alecia)
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boots Retail USA, Inc. by Renee D. Wasserman (Wasserman, Renee)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Whitney Miner to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. (mk)
May 24, 2021 Filing 14 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to David B. Levin (daj, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18278338. (Miner, Whitney)
May 22, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Renee Wasserman and Alecia Cotton to appear pro hac vice #10 #11 are granted. (mk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18275419. (Cotton, Alecia)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18275371. (Wasserman, Renee)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by David B. Levin (Levin, David)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Boots Retail USA, Inc. (Andalman, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boots Retail USA, Inc. by Kristin T. Opal (Opal, Kristin)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boots Retail USA, Inc. by Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn (Blackburn, Rachael)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boots Retail USA, Inc. by Robert M. Andalman (Andalman, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Andalman, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020 CH 07176) filed by Boots Retail USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18273146. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Andalman, Robert)
May 21, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. Boots Retail USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boots Retail USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Represented By: Alecia E Cotton
Represented By: Renee D. Wasserman
Represented By: Emily Angela Wieser
Represented By: Whitney R. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norah Flaherty
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?