Lloyd v. Joshi, et. al.
Plaintiff: Ernestine Lloyd
Defendant: United States, Atul Joshi and Ingalls Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 1:2021cv02782
Filed: May 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by United States(Phillip, Danielle)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of Danielle Anne Phillip as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States (Phillip, Danielle)
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingalls Memorial Hospital(Irvin, Scott)
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ingalls Memorial Hospital by Jason David Gluskin (Gluskin, Jason)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Atul Joshi (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Slovis, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernestine Lloyd as to United States served on 6/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021, AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant United States regarding Copy of Complaint, Summons, and Order dated May 26, 2021 on 6/1/2021 (Nichols, James)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ernestine Lloyd. Ingalls Memorial Hospital waiver sent on 5/22/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Nichols, James)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ernestine Lloyd. Atul Joshi waiver sent on 5/22/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Nichols, James)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ingalls Memorial Hospital by Scott E. Irvin (Irvin, Scott)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by August 16, 2021. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's routine motion to appoint special process server for service on Defendant United States of America (Dckt. No. #4 ) is hereby denied without prejudice. Plaintiff invokes Rule 4(c), which provides that the Court "may order that service be made by a United States marshal or deputy marshal or by a person specially appointed by the court." See Fed. R. Civ. 4(c). The need to invoke that rule typically arises when the plaintiff is incarcerated, and pro se, and needs help effectuating service of process. That is not the case here. Plaintiff has a lawyer, and is not incarcerated. Plaintiff also has a private process server, too. The Court sees no need to appoint a private process server to serve the United States. The private process server can simply serve the United States, without requiring this Court to do anything. If there is some genuine need for this Court to enter an order appointing a special process server, then Plaintiff can file another motion and explain why. But as things stand, the Court sees no need for a special appointment of a process server in a run-of-the-mill case against the United States. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Ernestine Lloyd Appoint Special Process Server (Nichols, James)
May 24, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United States, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (crl, ) Modified on 5/28/2021 (crl, ).
May 24, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
May 22, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ernestine Lloyd by James Emory Nichols (Nichols, James)
May 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nichols, James)
May 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ernestine Lloyd; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18276866.(Nichols, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Joshi, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Danielle Anne Phillip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atul Joshi
Represented By: Michael R. Slovis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingalls Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Scott E. Irvin
Represented By: Jason David Gluskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Lloyd
Represented By: James Emory Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?