Cole v. Rust-Oleum Corporation
Plaintiff: NANCY COLE
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv02816
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion for expansion of page limits and schedule for briefing on Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss #25 is granted. Page limits for opening and response briefs are expanded to 30 pages each; reply brief is expanded to 20 pages. Deadline for Plaintiff's response is 9/13/2021; Deadline for reply is 10/4/2021. Notice of motion date of 7/27/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rust-Oleum Corporation (Shepley, Madison)
July 19, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation for extension of time (JOINT), MOTION by Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation for leave to file excess pages (JOINT) (Shepley, Madison)
July 19, 2021 Filing 24 (JOINT MOTION) NOTICE of Motion by Madison Shepley for presentment of before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/27/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Shepley, Madison)
July 14, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the joint status report #22 filed on 7/13/2021, and in view of the pending motion to reassign the case to Judge Pacold under LR 40.4 as related to Case No. 20-cv-612, the initial status hearing set for 7/16/2021 with Judge Dow is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Counsel are directed to promptly notify Judge Dow's Courtroom Deputy by email if the motion to reassign is denied so that the initial status hearing with Judge Dow can be rescheduled. If the case is reassigned, then all further proceedings will obviously take place before Judge Pacold. Emailed notice (cdh, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 22 STATUS Report Initial Joint Status Report by Nancy Cole (Ahdoot, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nancy Cole by Robert Ahdoot (Ahdoot, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nancy Cole by Christopher E. Stiner (Stiner, Christopher)
July 6, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nancy Cole by Andrew W Ferich (Ferich, Andrew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation by Ashleigh Kaspari (Kaspari, Ashleigh)
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation by Alec Harris (Harris, Alec)
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation by Charles Walter Steese (Steese, Charles)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation by IJay Palansky (Palansky, IJay)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motions by Andrew W. Ferich, Christopher E. Stiner, and Robert R. Ahdoot for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Nancy Cole, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated [3, 4, 5] are graned. Motions by Charles W. Steese, IJay Palansky, Alec Paul Harris, and Ashleigh Mary Kaspari for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Rust-Oleum Corporation [10, 11, 12, 13] are granted. Emailed notice (cdh, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18415581. (Kaspari, Ashleigh)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18415564. (Harris, Alec)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18415533. (Palansky, IJay)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18415517. (Steese, Charles)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation by Anthony Joseph Monaco (Monaco, Anthony)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation by Madison Shepley (Shepley, Madison)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nancy Cole. Rust-Oleum Corporation waiver sent on 6/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Carroll, Katrina)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 7/16/2021 at 9:30 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Joint status report due by 7/13/2021. Motions by Andrew W. Ferich, Christopher E. Stiner, and Robert R. Ahdoot for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiff #3 , #4 , #5 are granted. Emailed notice (cdh, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18321225. (Ahdoot, Robert)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18310928. (Stiner, Christopher)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18308010. (Ferich, Andrew)
May 26, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation (crl, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NANCY COLE by Katrina Carroll (Carroll, Katrina)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by NANCY COLE; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18286320. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Katrina)
May 25, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Rust-Oleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation
Represented By: Charles Walter Steese
Represented By: IJay Palansky
Represented By: Alec Harris
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Monaco
Represented By: Ashleigh Kaspari
Represented By: Madison Shepley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY COLE
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Represented By: Andrew W. Ferich
Represented By: Christopher E. Stiner
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?