Fix v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: John Fix
Defendant: Bojan Simic, CITY OF CHICAGO, Michael Seiser, Officers Unknown, Reginald Foster, Shannon Martin, Richard Bankus, Brandon Neita-Scott and Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2021cv02843
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 7/30/2021 is stricken and reset to 8/13/2021 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #15 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed on or before 8/2/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead UNOPPOSED (Campbell, Andrea)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Andrea Lindsey Campbell (Campbell, Andrea)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Fix as to Michael Seiser on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Fine, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Fix as to Bojan Simic on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Fine, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Fix as to Brandon Neita-Scott on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Fine, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Fix (Fine, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Fix as to Reginald Foster on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Fine, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Fix as to Richard Bankus on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Fine, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Fix as to Shannon Martin on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Fine, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Cheryl Lynne Friedman (Friedman, Cheryl)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Michael Seiser. (dxb, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 7/30/2021 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Richard Bankus, City of Chicago, Reginald Foster, Shannon Martin, Brandon Neita-Scott, Michael Seiser, Bojan Simic (crl, )
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Fix by Jonathan M. Brayman (Brayman, Jonathan)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Fix by Steven H. Fine (Fine, Steven)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fine, Steven)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Fix; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18290545.(Fine, Steven)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fix v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bojan Simic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Andrea Lindsey Campbell
Represented By: Cheryl Lynne Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Seiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bankus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Neita-Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fix
Represented By: Steven H. Fine
Represented By: Jonathan M. Brayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?