Stegall v. Newcomb et al
Plaintiff: Risa Stegall
Defendant: United States Of America(FTCA) and Timothy Newcomb
Case Number: 1:2021cv02935
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal [Dkt. No. #16 ], this case is dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Status hearing date is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF of service by Risa Stegall. (Document does not contain case number) (lma, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Risa Stegall (lma, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: We have reviewed Plaintiff's Amended Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (Dkt. No. #14 .) We granted Plaintiff's original application to proceed in forma pauperis on July 6, 2021. (Dkt. No. #13 .) Accordingly, the Amended Application is denied as moot. Mailed notice (ags)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Risa Stegall for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lma, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is granted. (Dkt. No. #11 .) Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Representation is denied without prejudice. (Dkt. No. #12 .) Plaintiff indicates that her highest level of education is "post-graduate," and that she has previous experience as a litigant. (Dkt. No. #12 at 1, 2 (citing Stegall v. Social Security Admin,, No. 14-cv-00178 (N.D. Ill.).) We find that Plaintiff is competent to represent herself, at least at this current early stage of litigation, when counsel is often unnecessary. See Romanelli v. Suliene, 615 F.3d 847, 852 (7th Cir. 2010). As the case proceeds, Plaintiff may file a renewed motion for attorney representation if she believes that, given the legal complexity of the case, she cannot continue to represent herself. See U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Comm'n v. Powderly, No. 17 C 3262, 2018 WL 11201437, at *2 (N.D. Ill. June 27, 2018); see also Eagen v. Dempsey, 987 F.3d 667, 68486 (7th Cir. 2021). If Plaintiff continues to desire counsel in this case, we encourage her to contact more attorneys about representing her, and to collect documentation of her attempts to retain counsel. Flanagan v. Cook Cty. Adult Prob. Dep't, No. 15 C 7993, 2016 WL 1595065, at *3 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 21, 2016). It is so ordered. Mailed notice (ags)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Risa Stegall for attorney representation (sxb, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Risa Stegall for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (sxb, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #7 is due by 7/20/2021; defendants' reply by 8/10/2021. The status hearing set for 8/5/2021 is stricken and reset to 10/14/2021 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR by United States Of America(FTCA) (Phillip, Danielle) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/8/2021) (ags, ). Docket text modified on 6/8/2021 (ags).
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Danielle Anne Phillip on behalf of United States Of America(FTCA) regarding MOTION by Defendant United States Of America(FTCA) to dismiss #7 (Phillip, Danielle)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant United States Of America(FTCA) to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Phillip, Danielle)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Danielle Anne Phillip on behalf of United States Of America(FTCA) regarding notice of removal #1 (Phillip, Danielle)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 8/5/2021 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED notice of removal letter to Risa Stegall (kl, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Danielle Anne Phillip as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Of America(FTCA) (Phillip, Danielle)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Phillip, Danielle)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020 L 005045) filed by United States Of America(FTCA) Notice of Removal of a Civil Action and Substitution of the United States as Defendant (Phillip, Danielle)
June 1, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stegall v. Newcomb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America(FTCA)
Represented By: Danielle Anne Phillip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Risa Stegall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?