Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund et al v Climate Pros Inc.
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund and Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A.
Defendant: Climate Pros, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03044
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter coming before the Court on the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint ("Motion") #8 filed by Climate Pros, LLC f/k/a Climate Pros, Inc. ("Defendant"), Plaintiff having no objection to the request for relief set forth in the Motion, and the Court being duly advised in the premises, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Motion #8 is granted in its entirety, and Defendant's answer or other response to the Complaint (Dkt. 1) shall be due on or before September 7, 2021. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/29/2021. Mailed notice (nsf, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 First AMENDED complaint by Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A., Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund against Climate Pros, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NSMA 8.1.10 to 7.31.15, #2 Exhibit NSMA 8.1.15 to 7.31.20, #3 Exhibit Extension of NSMA, #4 Exhibit CBA 2019 to 2022, #5 Exhibit Pension Fund Trust Agreement, #6 Exhibit Welfare Fund Trust Agreement)(Krol, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Climate Pros, Inc. by Carolyn E Isaac (Isaac, Carolyn)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Climate Pros, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead to complaint (unopposed) (Tedrowe, Courtney)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Climate Pros, Inc. by Courtney D Tedrowe (Tedrowe, Courtney)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A., Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund. All Defendants. (Decker, Adam)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A. by Adam Decker (Decker, Adam)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A. by William M. Blumthal, Jr (Blumthal, William)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A. by Jeffrey Allen Krol (Krol, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krol, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A., Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18324601. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NSMA 8.1.10 to 7.31.15, #2 Exhibit NSMA 8.1.15 to 7.31.20, #3 Exhibit Extension of NSMA, #4 Exhibit CBA 2019 to 2022, #5 Exhibit Pension Fund Trust Agreement, #6 Exhibit Welfare Fund Trust Agreement)(Krol, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund et al v Climate Pros Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Represented By: Adam Decker
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Industry Promotion Trust Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Represented By: Adam Decker
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Supplemental Retirement Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Represented By: Adam Decker
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Sub Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Represented By: Adam Decker
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Education Trust Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Represented By: Adam Decker
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Represented By: Adam Decker
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters & Mechanical Equipment Service, Local Union No. 392 U.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Krol
Represented By: Adam Decker
Represented By: William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Climate Pros, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney D Tedrowe
Represented By: Carolyn E Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?