Mohammed v. Jenner & Block et al
Plaintiff: Abdul Mohammed
Defendant: Jenner & Block, Reid Schar, Rasier LLC, Littler Mendelson PC, Ryan Graves, Mat Henley, Daniel Bobier, Uber Technologies Inc., Antonio Romanucci, Megan Poetzel, Jody Boquist, Nick Gicinto, Dara Khosrowshahi, Travis Kalanick, Romanucci and Blandin LLC, Jennifer Schilling and Craig Clark
Case Number: 1:2021cv03261
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 8/17/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Correction regarding Response #23 (jn, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: On June 17, 2020, the Executive Committee for the Northern District of Illinois entered an order in Case No. 20cv3479 placing restraints on plaintiff Abdul Mohammed's ability to file new cases in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. The June 2020 order states, in part, that "any new complaints filed by Mr. Mohammed and transferred to this Court from another jurisdiction shall be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed." Under these circumstances, the Court grants defendants' motion to stay this lawsuit, including the defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise plead, and, refers this lawsuit to the Executive Committee #20 . The Court denies without prejudice defendants' request to enjoin Mr. Mohammed from filing any additional complaints against them at this time. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 25, 2021 Filing 23 ENTERED IN ERROR. (jn, ) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jn, ).
July 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Kerri Lynn Feczko for presentment of motion to stay, #20 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/29/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Feczko, Kerri)
July 23, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Daniel Bobier, Jody Boquist, Jenner & Block, Dara Khosrowshahi, Littler Mendelson PC, Megan Poetzel, Rasier LLC, Antonio Romanucci, Romanucci and Blandin LLC, Reid Schar, Jennifer Schilling, Uber Technologies Inc. to stay Case Pending Review (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Feczko, Kerri)
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' joint motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint #17 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed on or before 7/23/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Abdul Mohammed (rp, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Jody Boquist, Dara Khosrowshahi, Littler Mendelson PC, Rasier LLC, Jennifer Schilling, Uber Technologies Inc. for extension of time to file answer DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Feczko, Kerri)
June 24, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Jennifer Youpa's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #15 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18385287. (Youpa, Jennifer)
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing set is for 8/17/2021 at 9:30 AM. Defendant is directed to advise the Plaintiff of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT OF DEFENDANTS LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C., JODY BOQUIST AND JENNIFER SCHILLING TO REMOVAL by Jody Boquist, Littler Mendelson PC, Jennifer Schilling (Feczko, Kerri)
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 Consent to Removal by Antonio Romanucci, Romanucci and Blandin LLC (Friedl, Jason)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Antonio Romanucci, Romanucci and Blandin LLC by Jason John Friedl (Friedl, Jason)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/21/2021. (kl, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 Consent to Removal by Daniel Bobier, Jenner & Block, Megan Poetzel, Reid Schar (Stauffer, Robert)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Daniel Bobier, Jenner & Block, Megan Poetzel, Reid Schar by Katharine Rachel McLaughlin (McLaughlin, Katharine)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Daniel Bobier, Jenner & Block, Megan Poetzel, Reid Schar by David Eric Jimenez-Ekman (Jimenez-Ekman, David)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Daniel Bobier, Jenner & Block, Megan Poetzel, Reid Schar by Robert R. Stauffer (Stauffer, Robert)
June 21, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Antonio Romanucci, Romanucci and Blandin LLC by David Adam Neiman (Neiman, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dara Khosrowshahi, Rasier LLC, Uber Technologies Inc. by Jennifer L. Schilling (Schilling, Jennifer)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rasier LLC, Uber Technologies Inc. (Feczko, Kerri)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jody Boquist, Dara Khosrowshahi, Littler Mendelson PC, Rasier LLC, Jennifer Schilling, Uber Technologies Inc. by Kerri Lynn Feczko (Feczko, Kerri)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Law Division, case number (2021L000284) filed by Jody Boquist, Dara Khosrowshahi, Littler Mendelson PC, Jennifer Schilling, Uber Technologies Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18367238. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to O, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feczko, Kerri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. Jenner & Block et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenner & Block
Represented By: David Eric Jimenez-Ekman
Represented By: Robert R. Stauffer
Represented By: Katharine Rachel McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid Schar
Represented By: David Eric Jimenez-Ekman
Represented By: Robert R. Stauffer
Represented By: Katharine Rachel McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier LLC
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Feczko
Represented By: Jennifer L. Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littler Mendelson PC
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Feczko
Represented By: Jennifer A. Youpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mat Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bobier
Represented By: David Eric Jimenez-Ekman
Represented By: Robert R. Stauffer
Represented By: Katharine Rachel McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Feczko
Represented By: Jennifer L. Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Romanucci
Represented By: David Adam Neiman
Represented By: Friedl John Jason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Poetzel
Represented By: David Eric Jimenez-Ekman
Represented By: Robert R. Stauffer
Represented By: Katharine Rachel McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Boquist
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Feczko
Represented By: Jennifer A. Youpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Gicinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dara Khosrowshahi
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Feczko
Represented By: Jennifer L. Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kalanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romanucci and Blandin LLC
Represented By: David Adam Neiman
Represented By: Friedl John Jason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Schilling
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Feczko
Represented By: Jennifer A. Youpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?