Antsy Labs, LLC et al v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint
Plaintiff: Zuru Inc. and Antsy Labs, LLC
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint and Yokuna
Case Number: 1:2021cv03297
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yokuna by Timothy Tiewei Wang (Wang, Timothy)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the entry of the sealed TRO on 8/9/2021, the status hearing set for 8/10/2021 is stricken and reset to 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/9/2021. Emailed notice(cdh, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint (jmk, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. by Dinah Ortiz (Ortiz, Dinah)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. by Andrew Holland (Holland, Andrew)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held telephonically. Motion by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC to seal Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Under Seal #5 is granted. Motion by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC for temporary restraining order Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion For Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including A Temporary Injunction, A Temporary Transfer Of The Defendant Domain Names, A Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process By Email And/Or Electronic Publication #6 is granted. Motion by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limitation in Their Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order #7 is granted. Counsel to submit a proposed order in Word format to the Court's Proposed Order Box. Signed order to follow. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Additional Appearance #12 is granted. A further hearing is set for 8/10/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motions [ #5 , #6 , #7 , #12 ] set for 7/27/2021 at 9:15 a.m. will be heard telephonically. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #7 , motion to seal #5 , motion for leave to appear, #12 , motion for temporary restraining order, #6 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/27/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Thompson, James)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Additional Appearance MOTION by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC for leave to appear as Additional Appearance Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Additional Appearance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thompson, James)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (exr, )
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC Proposed Temporary Restraining Order (Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC Exhibit 2 of Drysdale Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC Scheduled A to Complaint (Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limitation in Their Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC for temporary restraining order Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion For Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including A Temporary Injunction, A Temporary Transfer Of The Defendant Domain Names, A Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process By Email And/Or Electronic Publication (Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Antsy Labs, LLC to seal Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Under Seal (Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. by James L. Thompson (Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Antsy Labs, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18370711. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Thompson, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antsy Labs, LLC et al v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuru Inc.
Represented By: James L. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew Holland
Represented By: Dinah Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antsy Labs, LLC
Represented By: James L. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew Holland
Represented By: Dinah Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yokuna
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?