Gootrad v. Suburban Surgical Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter Gootrad
Defendant: Suburban Surgical Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03426
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Suburban Surgical Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Best, Susan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Suburban Surgical Company, Inc. by Susan Jane Best (Best, Susan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Suburban Surgical Company, Inc. by Stephanie Frances Jones (Jones, Stephanie)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Peter Gootrad. Suburban Surgical Company, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Martin, Alexis)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before September 10, 2021. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with the Tenth Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 6/28/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peter Gootrad by Madeline K. Engel (Engel, Madeline)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peter Gootrad by Alexis D Martin (Martin, Alexis)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Martin, Alexis)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Peter Gootrad; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18393543.(Martin, Alexis)
June 25, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gootrad v. Suburban Surgical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Gootrad
Represented By: Madeline K. Engel
Represented By: Alexis D Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suburban Surgical Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Frances Jones
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?