Corona v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lizette Corona
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv03517
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file the electronic certified administrative record and answer to plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted up to and including 10/29/21. Mailed notice (ao, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(North, Sarah)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Weisman. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Parties shall follow the briefing schedule set forth in Local Rule 16.4. Mailed notice (ao, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable M. David Weisman, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 07/09/2021. (rc, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Sarah J. North as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (North, Sarah)
July 1, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lizette Corona for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lizette Corona by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lizette Corona; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizette Corona
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Sarah J. North
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?