Rudy v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Rudy
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03575
Filed: July 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Heather Rudy. Family Dollar Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 8/3/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 10/7/2021 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Heather Rudy by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 6, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
July 6, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Family Dollar Stores, Inc. (mxo, )
July 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Heather Rudy; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18420748.(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudy v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Rudy
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?