United States of America v. Sfeir
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jorge Sfeir
Case Number: 1:2021cv03602
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Petitioner's "motion introduced by Jorge Sfeir M.D. for court consideration requesting with all due respect" #9 is denied, including defendant's request to extend his date to report to the Bureau of Prisons. The court entered judgment in this matter on 7/12/2021 #8 closing the case. To the extent the instant motion #9 was meant to be a motion to alter or amend judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 it is denied. Defendant may consider filing a motion for compassionate release in his criminal case pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3582(c)(1)(A) after exhausting his administrative remedies. Mailed notice (cn).
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Jorge Sfeir for court consideration (Exhibits) (gw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 7/12/2021. Mailed notice (cn).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Defendant Jorge Sfeir has filed two identical motions to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence by a person in federal custody #1 #5 . For the following reasons, the court, sua sponte, denies both of those motions. First, the court considered all of the matters defendant raises in his 2255 motions at sentencing, including his military service, physical condition, age, and family circumstances. In considering those factors under 18 U.S.C. 3553(a), the court imposed a sentence of 18 months, substantially below the advisory guideline sentence of between 70 and 87 months. The court noted in its Judgement and Commitment Order that defendant caused a loss of more than four million dollars to the United States Government in connection with a serious Medicare fraud scheme, and also noted that the criminal conduct at issue seemed totally aberrant. Consequently, the court imposed a sentence far below the guidelines to account for the matters set forth above. Finally, defendant's 2255 motions fail to identify any constitutional violation or any other matter that would justify relief under that statute. For these reasons, the court denies the motions #1 #5 . and dismisses the case with prejudice. Defendant's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/12/2021. Mailed notice (cn).
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Madeleine Sullivan Murphy as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Murphy, Madeleine)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Jorge Sfeirto Vacate, Set ASIDE, or Correct Sentency by a person in Federal Custody. (Attachments). (gcy, ) Modified on 7/12/2021 (gcy, ).
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant Jorge Sfeir for attorney representation. (gcy, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Jorge Sfeir. (gcy, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Incorrect PDL Link Corrected on 7/8/2021) (gcy, ). Modified on 7/8/2021 (gcy, ).
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Jorge Sfeir (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4). (Exhibits). (16cr837).(gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sfeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kavitha J Babu
Represented By: Madeleine Sullivan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Sfeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?