SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC v. Canelo et al
Plaintiff: SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC
Defendant: Emilio E Canelo, Roberto Suastegui and Emillio E Canelo
Case Number: 1:2021cv04000
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1725
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Emilio E Canelo. (rc, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC as to Emilio E Canelo on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Burt, Marshall)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC as to Emilio E Canelo. (Burt, Marshall)
August 27, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Emilio E Canelo. (mxo, )
August 25, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Emilio E Canelo. (mxo, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC as to Roberto Suastegui. (Burt, Marshall)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC as to Emilio E Canelo. (Burt, Marshall)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 10/12/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18506831.(Burt, Marshall)
July 28, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Roberto Suastegui (jg, )
July 28, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Emilio E Canelo. (lxk, )
July 28, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC v. Canelo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMS Financial Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Marshall J. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio E Canelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Suastegui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emillio E Canelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?