Kaminski v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Ashley M. Kaminski
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04077
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Beth W Jantz
Referring Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed by Ashley M. Kaminski; (bg, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jantz upon the parties' consent. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #7 demonstrates her indigence and is accordingly granted. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, within 60 days after the filing of the administrative record, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file a response and brief in support of affirming the decision subject to review. The plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Jantz's standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Jantz's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Given the current public health situation, this Court will accommodate reasonable requests for extensions in the coming weeks, and counsel and the parties should show flexibility and be willing to accommodate each other as well. Mailed notice. (as, )
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Beth W. Jantz, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1Z(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/5/2021.(jh, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ashley M. Kaminski for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Ling, Ernest)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff has filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 ; however, the incorrect document was linked to the filing. Plaintiff is directed to file a corrected application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for the court's consideration. Parties are strongly encouraged to consent to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 INCORRECT DOCUMENT LINKED (Marvin, Cody) Modified on 8/2/2021 (rbf, ).
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ashley M. Kaminski by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ashley M. Kaminski; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
July 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaminski v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley M. Kaminski
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ernest Yi Ling
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?