Lofton v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jermel Lofton
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04217
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file the electronic certified administrative record and answer to plaintiff's complaint #8 is granted up to and including 12/7/21. Mailed notice. (pk, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Przywara, Kathleen)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable M. David Weisman, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Jorge L. Alonso no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/16/2021. (exr, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge. This case will be sent to the executive committee for reassignment. All pending dates before this Court are stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Kathleen M. Przywara as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Przywara, Kathleen)
August 11, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jermel Lofton by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jermel Lofton; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18547816. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofton v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermel Lofton
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathleen M. Przywara
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?