Shumaker v. Lyft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cleon Shumaker
Defendant: Lyft, Inc. and Lyft Illinois, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04267
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO HIPAA Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/4/2021. Emailed notice(cdh, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the joint status report #15 filed on 9/27/2021, the Court adopts the parties' proposed discovery plan: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures to be completed by 10/8/2021; fact discovery to close on 4/30/2022. The Court will defer setting any expert deadlines until after the completion of fact discovery. An interim joint status report on the progress of discovery is due no later than 1/31/2022. Emailed notice (cdh, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 STATUS Report (Joint, Initial) by Lyft Illinois, Inc., Lyft, Inc. (Maruna, James)
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed motion for entry of HIPAA protective order #12 is granted. Signed order to follow. Notice of motion date of 9/29/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Counsel are reminded that a joint status report including (a) an agreed briefing schedule on any motion to dismiss that is filed, (b) a proposed discovery plan, and (c) a statement in regard to any settlement discussions or any mutual interest in a referral to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference was due by 9/24/2021 [see 9] and are directed to file the overdue joint status report as soon as possible and no later than 10/4/2021. Emailed notice (cdh, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by James F. Maruna for presentment of motion for protective order #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/29/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Maruna, James)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Lyft, Inc. for protective order pursuant to HIPAA (UNOPPOSED) (Maruna, James)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and affirmative defenses by Lyft, Inc.(Maruna, James)
September 12, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Cleon Shumaker (O'Connor, Bryan)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted to and including 9/17/2021. Joint status report including (a) an agreed briefing schedule on any motion to dismiss that is filed, (b) a proposed discovery plan, and (c) a statement in regard to any settlement discussions or any mutual interest in a referral to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference is due no later than 9/24/2021. Notice of motion dates of 8/24/2021 and 8/27/2021 are stricken and no appearances are necessary on those dates. Emailed notice (cdh, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by James F. Maruna for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/24/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Maruna, James)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Lyft Illinois, Inc., Lyft, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Maruna, James)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ec, )
August 11, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Lyft Illinois, Inc., Lyft, Inc. by James F. Maruna (Maruna, James)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Lyft Illinois, Inc., Lyft, Inc. by Richard Charles Huettel (Huettel, Richard)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Lyft Illinois, Inc., Lyft, Inc. by Erik L. Andersen (Andersen, Erik)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Andersen, Erik)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021 L 005591) filed by Lyft Illinois, Inc., Lyft, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18552830. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Andersen, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumaker v. Lyft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleon Shumaker
Represented By: Bryan John O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Erik L. Andersen
Represented By: James F. Maruna
Represented By: Richard Charles Huettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Erik L. Andersen
Represented By: James F. Maruna
Represented By: Richard Charles Huettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?