Boyett v. Marten Transport Services, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Deunta Boyett
Defendant: Marten Transport Services, LTD., Mohammad Ali Yasin and Marten Transport, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04345
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 STATUS Report by Deunta Boyett (Gutierrez, Samantha)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD. on 09/17/2021 by Plaintiff Deunta Boyett. Waiver of service due by 10/22/2021. (Gutierrez, Samantha)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED complaint by Deunta Boyett against All Defendants (Gutierrez, Samantha)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 10/19/2021 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to RANDOLPH MARTEN AS AGENT OF MARTEN TRANSPORT SERVICES, LTD. on 08/16/2021 by Plaintiff Deunta Boyett. Waiver of service due by 9/20/2021. (Gutierrez, Samantha)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deunta Boyett by Neal S Gainsberg (Gainsberg, Neal)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to MARTEN TRANSPORT SERVICES, LTD. on 08/16/2021 by Plaintiff Deunta Boyett. Waiver of service due by 9/20/2021. (Gutierrez, Samantha)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to MOHAMMAD ALI YASIN on 08/16/2021 by Plaintiff Deunta Boyett. Waiver of service due by 9/20/2021. (Gutierrez, Samantha)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deunta Boyett; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18568327. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gutierrez, Samantha)
August 16, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyett v. Marten Transport Services, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deunta Boyett
Represented By: Neal S Gainsberg
Represented By: Samantha Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport Services, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Ali Yasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?