Friedman v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Michael B. Friedman
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04399
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Referring Judge: Young B Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The government is directed to file the administrative record by November 1, 2021. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by January 3, 2022. The government's response and/or cross- motion for summary judgment is due by March 7, 2022. If Plaintiff believes that a reply is necessary, he may file a reply brief by March 21, 2022, but one is not required. Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing the final agency decision must include a section with a recitation of the relevant facts and a separate section identifying the statement of the issues presented in the brief. The statement of issues must set out a numbered list of issues for the court's consideration. The issue statement must also identify with specificity the aspects of the Commissioner's final decision that Plaintiff challenges, along with a concise explanation of why Plaintiff believes the challenged aspects are unsupported by substantial evidence. In the argument section of its response the government must address each issue Plaintiff identifies in his or her brief's statement of the issues. Mailed notice (ma,)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Judge Young B. Kim pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Gary Feinerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/24/2021. (kl, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties have consented to proceed before Magistrate Judge Kim #6 . The status hearing set for 10/19/2021 #4 is stricken. This case will be forwarded to the Executive Committee for reassignment to Magistrate Judge Kim for further proceedings.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Jonathan C. Haile as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Haile, Jonathan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Initial status hearing set for 10/19/2021 at 9:00 a.m. By 10/12/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether they agree to a remand and whether they consent to reassignment for all purposes to the Magistrate Judge. With respect to scheduling, the parties shall comply with Local Rule 16.4. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael B. Friedman by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael B. Friedman; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18578520. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
August 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedman v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Friedman
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?