Knudson v. Bayer HealthCare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Judy Knudson
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC and Elanco Animal Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04449
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by John P Mandler, P (Mandler, John)
September 16, 2021 Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrea Roberts Pierson (Pierson, Andrea)
September 16, 2021 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrew Campbell (Campbell, Andrew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Blake Anthony Angelino (Angelino, Blake)
August 26, 2021 Filing 54 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record (bg, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 53 RECEIVED from Missouri Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-03108 (bg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 52 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-1, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Illinois to be included in MDL No. 3009. Signed on 8/19/2021. Case electronically transferred. (Keller, Jeanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Plaintiff Judy Knudson.(Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED FORMAT FOR DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS ORDER. Signed on 7/15/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 7/15/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Filing 48 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. The Status Conferences previously set for 10/8/2021 at 9:00 AM has been RESET to 10/5/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents filed by Jason Kyle Ward on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc..(Ward, Jason) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc..(Ismail, Tarek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Jason Kyle Ward on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc..(Ward, Jason) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 30, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed on 6/29/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Status Conferences set for 10/8/2021 at 9:00 AM and 11/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 6/29/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 42 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/29/2021. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Courtney Stout, Michael Williams and Matthew Dameron. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Tarek Ismail, Rebecca Schwartz and Jason Ward. Time in court: 1:55 p.m. to 2:36 p.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 41 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John R. Phillips(Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of appearance by Jason Kyle Ward on behalf of Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. (Attorney Jason Kyle Ward added to party Bayer HealthCare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Kyle Ward added to party Elanco Animal Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ward, Jason) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of appearance by Rebecca J. Schwartz on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Rebecca J. Schwartz added to party Bayer HealthCare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca J. Schwartz added to party Elanco Animal Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schwartz, Rebecca) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #23 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; denying #23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed on 6/25/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 37 Before the Court is Defendants Motion to Withdraw Defendants Motion to Transfer. (Doc. #35.) Upon review, Defendants Motion to Withdraw (Doc. #35) is GRANTED and Defendants Motion to Transfer (Doc. #25) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 6/25/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Tarek Ismail on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc..(Ismail, Tarek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to withdraw document #25 MOTION to reassign/transfer case , #26 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Tarek Ismail on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #25 , #26 ) (Ismail, Tarek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #23 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tarek Ismail on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Ismail, Tarek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 33 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John R. Phillips(Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ismail, Tarek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 31 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Plaintiff's Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Schedule by Judy Knudson. (Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #17 motion to appoint counsel. The Court hereby appoints the following Interim Class Counsel: Matthew Lee Dameron,Michael Anthony Williams,Courtney Marie Stout. Signed on 6/15/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Judy Knudson filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Plaintiff Judy Knudson.(Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 28 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #25 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Plaintiff Judy Knudson. Reply suggestions due by 6/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #23 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Plaintiff Judy Knudson. Reply suggestions due by 6/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 26 SUGGESTIONS in support re #25 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Laura Sexton on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - McDermott Complaint)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Sexton, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 25 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ORDER DATED 6/25/2021 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Laura Sexton on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Laura) Modified on 6/29/2021 (Furtak, Rebecca). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in support re #23 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Laura Sexton on behalf of Defendants Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Sexton, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Laura Sexton on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Rami N Fakhouri for Bayer HealthCare LLC and Elanco Animal Health, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Tarek Ismail for Bayer HealthCare LLC and Elanco Animal Health, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 20 Motion to allow Rami N. Fakhouri to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7447923) filed by Kerensa Cassis on behalf of All Defendants. (Cassis, Kerensa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to allow Tarek Ismail to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7447866) filed by Kerensa Cassis on behalf of All Defendants. (Cassis, Kerensa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of Teleconference held May 21, 2021, before Judge Stephen R. Bough. Court Reporter: Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. Number of pages: 10. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the parties' intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.mow.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. NOTICE: Attorneys must contact the court reporter for copies during this 90 day period. If necessary, Notice of Intent to Redact is due by 6/10/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2021. NOTICE: Attorneys must contact the court reporter for copies during this 90 day period. (Wambolt, Gayle) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 29, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to appoint counsel Under Rule 23(g) filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Judy Knudson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--WDD Firm Resume)(Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS OF BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC filed by Laura Sexton on behalf of Defendant Bayer HealthCare LLC.(Sexton, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS OF ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INC. filed by Laura Sexton on behalf of Defendant Elanco Animal Health, Inc..(Sexton, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 On May 21, 2021, the Court presided over a telephone conference with the parties. For the reasons stated during the telephone conference, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Defendants request for a temporary stay is DENIED; and (2) Defendants answer or other response to the Complaint is due on or before June 9, 2021. Signed on 5/21/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/21/2021. Time in court: 1:30 pm to 1:44 pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Laura Sexton for Bayer HealthCare LLC and Elanco Animal Health, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Laura Sexton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7423644) filed by Kerensa Cassis on behalf of All Defendants. (Attorney Kerensa Cassis added to party Bayer HealthCare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kerensa Cassis added to party Elanco Animal Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cassis, Kerensa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 1:30 p.m. before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Michael Anthony Williams on behalf of Judy Knudson (Attorney Michael Anthony Williams added to party Judy Knudson(pty:pla))(Williams, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 5/12/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Judy Knudson. Elanco Animal Health, Inc. served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Judy Knudson. Bayer HealthCare LLC served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with this case. New case number is 6:21-cv-03108-SRB. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Furtak, Rebecca) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment by Judy Knudson (Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Courtney Marie Stout on behalf of Judy Knudson (Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Judy Knudson(pty:pla))(Stout, Courtney) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 4, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Siegert, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Judy Knudson. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7400598. Service due by 8/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]
May 3, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 5/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knudson v. Bayer HealthCare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Knudson
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Represented By: Michael Anthony Williams
Represented By: Matthew Dameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Laura A Sexton
Represented By: Kerensa Cassis
Represented By: Rami N Fakhouri
Represented By: Rebecca Joy Schwartz
Represented By: Tarek Ismail
Represented By: Jason Kyle Ward
Represented By: John P Mandler
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Andrew Campbell
Represented By: Blake Anthony Angelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elanco Animal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kerensa Cassis
Represented By: Laura A Sexton
Represented By: Rami N Fakhouri
Represented By: Rebecca Joy Schwartz
Represented By: Tarek Ismail
Represented By: Jason Kyle Ward
Represented By: John P Mandler
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Andrew Campbell
Represented By: Blake Anthony Angelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?