Prusinski v. Garrett et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer A Prusinski
Defendant: William J Garrett and Lubenow Express, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv04474
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Entered in error. Modified on 10/20/2021 (rao, ).
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Lubenow Express, LLC to consolidate cases (Amended Agreed) (Kahan, Shimon)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Lubenow Express, LLC to consolidate cases (Kahan, Shimon)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant William J Garrett by Shimon Ben Kahan (Kahan, Shimon)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rc, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lubenow Express, LLC by Shimon Ben Kahan (Kahan, Shimon)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kahan, Shimon)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, Municipal Division, case number (2021M1011488) filed by Lubenow Express, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18591761. and Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Transfer Order)(Kahan, Shimon)
August 23, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prusinski v. Garrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer A Prusinski
Represented By: Clayton Bradley Krapfl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Garrett
Represented By: Shimon Ben Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubenow Express, LLC
Represented By: Shimon Ben Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?