Brantley v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Ella L. Brantley
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04530
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cummings
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cummings. Defendant to file administrative record by 11/08/2021. The Court will set a briefing schedule after the record has been filed. Mailed notice (yt)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Virginia M. Kendall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/9/21.(aee, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Nigel B Cooney as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Cooney, Nigel)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing and remanding the decision subject to review is due 60 days after administrative record is filed. The Commissioner's motion to affirm the decision and brief in support thereof are due 45 days after Plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after the Commissioner's brief is filed. Parties are encouraged to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge in order receive expeditious ruling on the matter due to the significant caseload of the District Court. Parties are to meet and confer within 14 days to discuss whether they jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. Please refer to the Consent Form attached.Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (lk, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ella L. Brantley by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ella L. Brantley ; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18600667. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
August 25, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella L. Brantley
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Nigel B Cooney
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?