The International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers District 141 v. United Airlines, Inc
Plaintiff: THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT 141 and The International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers District 141
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv04589
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by The International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers District 141 re amended complaint, #20 (McGuire, Michael)
October 25, 2021 Filing 20 First AMENDED complaint by The International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers District 141 against United Airlines, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(McGuire, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Because the parties agree #18 the discovery is not necessary before a ruling on the motion to dismiss #15 , the status hearing set for 10/27/2021 #7 is stricken. If the motion to dismiss is denied, the court will decide whether discovery is warranted and, if so, will solicit the parties' proposals for an appropriate schedule.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 18 STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by United Airlines, Inc (Siegel, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #15 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 11/2/2021; Defendant shall reply by 11/16/2021. Motion hearing set for 11/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 11/22/2021 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by United Airlines, Inc in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 (Siegel, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United Airlines, Inc (Siegel, Robert)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to appear pro hac vice #8 and #9 are granted. Motion for extension of time #13 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to 10/5/2021.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant United Airlines, Inc for extension of time UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Kaplan, Larry)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Airlines, Inc and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Kaplan, Larry)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc by Marnie Allison Holz (Holz, Marnie)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc by Larry S. Kaplan (Kaplan, Larry)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18670179. (Morales, M. Tristan)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18670140. (Siegel, Robert)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Initial status hearing set for 10/27/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 10/20/2021. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers District 141 as to United Airlines, Inc on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (McGuire, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT 141 by Gregory W. Hose (Hose, Gregory)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT 141 by Librado Arreola (Arreola, Librado)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT 141 by Michael J. McGuire (McGuire, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McGuire, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT 141; no. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18611395. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(McGuire, Michael)
August 27, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United Airlines, Inc (jg, )
August 27, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers District 141 v. United Airlines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT 141
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Represented By: Librado Arreola
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers District 141
Represented By: Librado Arreola
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc
Represented By: M. Tristan Morales
Represented By: Marnie Allison Holz
Represented By: Robert A. Siegel
Represented By: Larry S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?