Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Jio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC
Defendant: Jio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04623
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for continuance #5 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 10/19/2021 is reset to 12/21/2021 at 9:40 a.m. The parties shall use the same call-in information #2 . Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC to continue the Telephonic Status Hearing (Johnson, Jay)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18760240. (Johnson, Jay)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 10/19/2021 at 10:40 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 16, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jio, Inc. (ak, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18617354. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #3 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Senter, April)
August 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Jio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC
Represented By: April Brandi Senter
Represented By: Jay B Johnson
Represented By: April B Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?