Pearl IP :Licensing LLC v. Deep Sea Electronics
Plaintiff: Pearl IP :Licensing LLC
Defendant: Deep Sea Electronics
Case Number: 1:2021cv04624
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Pearl IP :Licensing LLC. Deep Sea Electronics waiver sent on 9/23/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Wernow, Howard)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for leave to have attorney Howard L. Wernow appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Attorney, Howard L. Wernow is granted leave to file his appearance. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18639427. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Courts of Admission)(Wernow, Howard)
September 6, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Parties are directed to file a Report of Parties Planning Meeting by 11/08/21. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearl IP :Licensing LLC by Luke A. Casson (Casson, Luke)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filing fee $402.00 receipt 0752-18617470 filed by Pearl IP :Licensing LLC; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Casson, Luke)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Casson, Luke)
August 30, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Deep Sea Electronics (txl, )
August 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearl IP :Licensing LLC v. Deep Sea Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl IP :Licensing LLC
Represented By: Luke A. Casson
Represented By: Howard L Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep Sea Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?