Bellamy v. Raytheon Technologies Corp.
Plaintiff: Bruce Bellamy
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04757
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's motion to strike #12 is taken under advisement. A response has been filed #13 . No reply will be needed unless the Court indicated otherwise in a future minute entry. Emailed notice (cdh, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Bruce Bellamyin Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike #12 (Jones, Patrick) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/4/2021) (jg, ).
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corp. to strike reply to response to motion, #11 (Nichols, Shane)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY by Bruce Bellamy to response in opposition to motion #9 , MOTION by Plaintiff Bruce Bellamy to remand #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Cook County Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Cook County civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit C - ND Ill civil cover sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Mathur Docket)(Jones, Patrick)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In light of the pending briefing schedule on the motion to remand, the deadline to file a joint status report is stricken. Emailed notice (cdh, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Raytheon Technologies Corp.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Bruce Bellamy to remand #6 (Nichols, Shane)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corp. by Shane Brian Nichols (Nichols, Shane)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion to remand #6 is taken under advisement; response is due by 10/18/2021; reply is due by 11/1/2021. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Initial telephone conference set for 11/5/2021 is stricken and will be reset after the Court rules on the pending motion if that motion is not granted. Emailed notice (cdh, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Bruce Bellamy to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cook County Compl, #2 Exhibit B - Wragge Compl, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal)(Jones, Patrick)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Raytheon Technologies Corp.(Bradley, Lisa)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 11/1/2021. Initial telephone conference is set for 11/5/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bruce Bellamy by Patrick M Jones (Jones, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rc, )
September 8, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court, Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021 L 1631) filed by Raytheon Technologies Corp. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18643170. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellamy v. Raytheon Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Bellamy
Represented By: Patrick M Jones
Represented By: Joseph Charles Wheeler
Represented By: Sarah Mathilde Beaujour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corp.
Represented By: Lisa Bradley
Represented By: Shane Brian Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?