Doe et al v. Illinois Department Of Children And Family Services(DCFS)
Plaintiff: Jane Doe and John Doe
Defendant: Melissa Vance and Illinois Department Of Children And Family Services(DCFS)
Case Number: 1:2021cv04819
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane Doe, John Doe. Melissa Vance waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (La Porte, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane Doe, John Doe. Illinois Department Of Children And Family Services(DCFS) waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (La Porte, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Illinois Department Of Children And Family Services(DCFS), Melissa Vance by Barbara Lynn Greenspan (Greenspan, Barbara)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe by Sara Elizabeth Gilloon (Gilloon, Sara)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 11/29/2021 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (axc).
September 13, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (La Porte, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jane Doe, John Doe; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18657023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1)(La Porte, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Illinois Department Of Children And Family Services(DCFS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Michael R. La Porte
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Gilloon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Michael R. La Porte
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Gilloon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Vance
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department Of Children And Family Services(DCFS)
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?