Gunderson v. Corcoran et al
Plaintiff: Sean Gunderson
Defendant: James P Corcoran, Bill Epperson, Richard Malis and Thomas Zubik
Case Number: 1:2021cv04891
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by Sean Gunderson against All Defendants (Kretchmar, Stuart)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants James P Corcoran, Bill Epperson, Richard Malis, Thomas Zubik by Erin Walsh (Walsh, Erin)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 11/29/2021 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (axc).
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sean Gunderson by Stuart Randolph Kretchmar (Kretchmar, Stuart)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kretchmar, Stuart)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sean Gunderson; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18670890. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit pursuant to Section 2-622, #2 Affidavit pursuant to Section 2-622, #3 Exhibit Letter/report from Dr. Tasch, #4 Exhibit Letter/report from Dr. Watson)(Kretchmar, Stuart)
September 15, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunderson v. Corcoran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Gunderson
Represented By: Stuart Randolph Kretchmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Corcoran
Represented By: Erin Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Epperson
Represented By: Erin Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Malis
Represented By: Erin Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Zubik
Represented By: Erin Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?