Morrison v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kenya Morrison
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04913
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Beth W Jantz
Referring Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jantz. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, within 60 days after the filing of the administrative record, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file a response and brief in support of affirming the decision subject to review. The plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Jantz's standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Jantz's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (as, )
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Beth W. Jantz, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/27/2021. (ph, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The parties have filed a Joint Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge #8 . This case will be referred to the Executive Committee for reassignment to the magistrate judge. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Kelly, Kathryn)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Kenya Morrison (Exhibits)(exr, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report within 60 days. Parties are encouraged to consent to proceed for all purposes before the Magistrate Judge. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kenya Morrison for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenya Morrison by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenya Morrison; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
September 16, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Morrison
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?