United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $62,500 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $62,500 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 1:2021cv04950
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The government's response to the motion to dismiss is due 12/3/21 and claimant's reply is due 12/17/21. The court will rule by cm/ecf. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Funds in the amount of $62,500 in United States Currency (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of Filing Certificate of Service)(Kwon, Jae)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funds in the amount of $62,500 in United States Currency by Jae K Kwon (Kwon, Jae)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funds in the amount of $62,500 in United States Currency by Jae K Kwon (Kwon, Jae)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 CLAIM by Funds in the amount of $62,500 in United States Currency regarding (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kwon, Jae)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Funds in the Amount of $62,500 in United States currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for arrest in rem)(aee, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 WARRANT issued for arrest in Rem to fund in the Amount of $62,500. (aee, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Kaitlin Grace Klamann as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Klamann, Kaitlin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Klamann, Kaitlin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE, IN REM (VERIFIED) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; (Klamann, Kaitlin)
September 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $62,500 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kaitlin Grace Klamann
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $62,500 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Jae K Kwon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?