Serechenko v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Sergey Serechenko
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04966
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Young B Kim
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Przywara, Kathleen)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The government is directed to file the administrative record by November 22, 2021. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by January 24, 2022. The government's response and/or cross- motion for summary judgment is due by March 21, 2022. If Plaintiff believes that a reply is necessary, he may file a reply brief by April 4, 2022, but one is not required. Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing the final agency decision must include a section with a recitation of the relevant facts and a separate section identifying the statement of the issues presented in the brief. The statement of issues must set out a numbered list of issues for the court's consideration. The issue statement must also identify with specificity the aspects of the Commissioner's final decision that Plaintiff challenges, along with a concise explanation of why Plaintiff believes the challenged aspects are unsupported by substantial evidence. In the argument section of its response the government must address each issue Plaintiff identifies in his or her brief's statement of the issues. Mailed notice (ma,)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Young B. Kim, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 9/24/2021. (jn, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Kathleen M. Przywara as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Przywara, Kathleen)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Sergey Serechenko for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sergey Serechenko by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sergey Serechenko; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
September 20, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serechenko v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergey Serechenko
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathleen M. Przywara
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?