Fitzner v. Cradle Adoption Partners NFP
Plaintiff: Casey Fitzner
Defendant: Cradle Adoption Partners NFP
Case Number: 1:2021cv05147
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #13 is granted. The parties' initial disclosures shall be exchanged by 12/17/21. The parties may adjust any interim discovery deadlines by agreement, but the deadline to complete fact discovery cannot be changed without court permission. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: The pre-settlement conference call set for 11/29/2021 is reset to 11/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Time change only. Call in information shall remain. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Cradle Adoption Partners NFP for extension of time (JOINT Motion) (Burkholder, Evan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Telephonic initial status conference on settlement held on 11/10/21, and continued to 11/29/21 at 9:30 a.m. To conserve the parties' resources and maximize settlement potential at this early stage of the case, the parties wish to explore settlement in advance of expending additional resources on discovery. Accordingly, the parties intend to jointly file with the District Judge a motion to stay existing discovery deadlines. The parties are directed to review and comply with this Court's standing order on settlement conferences, available on the Court's website. Plaintiff's formal settlement demand due to Defendant by 11/19/21; Defendant's formal counter-offer due to plaintiff by 11/23/21. To join the 11/29/21 status conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Counsel should bring theirs and their clients' calendar availability for a settlement conference (which can be by video, in person, or hybrid) to the status call on 11/29/21. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Jantz to conduct a settlement conference. The parties are directed to review and comply with Magistrate Judge Jantz's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences. A pre-settlement conference call is scheduled for 11/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. To join the conference by phone, dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Mailed notice. (as, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Beth W. Jantz for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference. (psm, )Notices mailed.
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by 11/29/21 and all fact discovery shall be noticed in time for completion by 5/15/22. The court expects the parties to issue written discovery sooner than February 2022. Any requests to amend the pleadings must be made by 3/16/22. An agreed proposed confidentiality order may be submitted to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Enter Expedited Referral to the Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. The parties shall file a status report on discovery and settlement progress on 2/16/22. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS Report (Initial) by Casey Fitzner (Rogers, Eric)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 11/1/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Cradle Adoption Partners NFP re Corporate Disclosure - Rule 7.1 (Burkholder, Evan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cradle Adoption Partners NFP by Evan A. Burkholder (Burkholder, Evan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cradle Adoption Partners NFP(Burkholder, Evan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Fitzner as to Cradle Adoption Partners NFP on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Rogers, Eric)
September 30, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Cradle Adoption Partners NFP (ey, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casey Fitzner by Eric Rogers (Rogers, Eric)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Casey Fitzner; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18717772. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Eric)
September 29, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzner v. Cradle Adoption Partners NFP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Fitzner
Represented By: Eric Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cradle Adoption Partners NFP
Represented By: Evan A. Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?