Rosenkalt v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Sylvie N. Rosenkalt
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv05149
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Referring Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Defendant's unopposed motion for first extension of time to file the electronic certified administrative record and answer to plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. Defendant shall file the administrative record and its answer by 12/29/2021. Mailed notice. (pk, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi for extension of time to file certified administrative record (unopposed) (Flannery, Kathleen)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Weisman. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Parties shall follow the briefing schedule set forth in Local Rule 16.4. Mailed notice. (pk, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable M. David Weisman, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/19/2021. (kl, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Kathleen Marie Flannery as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Flannery, Kathleen)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Sylvie N. Rosenkalt for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sylvie N. Rosenkalt by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sylvie N. Rosenkalt; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
September 29, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenkalt v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvie N. Rosenkalt
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flannery
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?