Chavarria v. Brothers Fleet Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter Chavarria
Defendant: Brothers Fleet Group, Inc. and James Seals
Case Number: 1:2021cv05174
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/4/21. Mailed notice (yt)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Unopposed Motion For A Qualified Protective Order Pursuant To HIPAA #15 is granted. ENTER ORDER. Mailed notice (yt)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Brothers Fleet Group, Inc. for protective order pursuant to HIPAA - Unopposed (Kahan, Shimon)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Joint Motion for Adoption of the Discovery Schedule Proposed in the Parties' Rule 26(f) Joint Initial Status Report #13 is granted. The schedule is as follows: Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures due by 12/1/21; Fact Non-Opinion Discovery (including depositions) completed by 7/1/22; Rule 26(a)(2)(c) Disclosures by 8/1/22; Rule 26(a)(2)(b) Disclosures with Reports by 10/1/22; Depositions of Rule 26(a)(2) Witnesses by 12/1/22; Expert discovery (including depositions) completed by 12/1/22; Dispositive Motions by 6/1/23. Mailed notice (yt)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Walter Chavarria for discovery Joint Motion for Adoption of the Discovery Schedule Proposed in the Parties' Rule 26(f) Joint Initial Status Report (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion for Adoption of the Discovery Schedule Proposed in the Parties' Rule 26(f) Joint Initial Status, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Argionis, George)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 26(f) by Walter Chavarria (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 26(f) Joint Initial Status Report)(Argionis, George)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Judge Pacold has referred the case here for settlement conference, discovery supervision and to extend discovery deadlines. #8 and #9 . The parties are to submit an agreed upon fact discovery (including depositions) and expert discovery (including depositions) schedule, if any, not later than 10/20/21. Local Rule 16.1 states in part, "discovery must be completed before the discovery closing date. Discovery requested before the discovery closing date, but not scheduled for completion before the discovery closing date, does not comply with this order." Once the discovery schedule is in place, counsel should also submit a joint status report every 6 weeks, signed by counsel, specifically detailing the progress of discovery for the reporting period. Telephone Status Conference is set for 1/4/22 at 11:30am. Counsel should call (888) 684-8852, access code 5618926.#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (yt)
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brothers Fleet Group, Inc., James Seals(Kahan, Shimon)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference, discovery supervision and to extend discovery deadlines.(ca, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, set/extend discovery deadlines, and settlement conference. (ca, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Walter Chavarria by George G. Argionis (Argionis, George)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Defendants Brothers Fleet Group, Inc., James Seals to text entry, #5 Response to Court's Order to Show Cause (Kahan, Shimon)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendants are ordered to show cause by 10/15/2021 why this case should not be remanded to the Circuit Court of Cook County. The notice of removal #1 premises jurisdiction on the diversity statute, 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), but it is unclear from plaintiff's complaint whether there is a reasonable probability that the amount-in-controversy exceeds $75,0000. (rao, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jg, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brothers Fleet Group, Inc., James Seals by Shimon Ben Kahan (Kahan, Shimon)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kahan, Shimon)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Twelfth Judicial District, Will County, IL, case number (2021 L 000646) filed by Brothers Fleet Group, Inc., James Seals Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18723188. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Kahan, Shimon)
September 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavarria v. Brothers Fleet Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Chavarria
Represented By: George G. Argionis
Represented By: Logan J. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Fleet Group, Inc.
Represented By: Shimon Ben Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Seals
Represented By: Shimon Ben Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?