Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05304
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 12/20/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Having established, at least for pleading purposes, that subject matter jurisdiction exists #4 , Plaintiff has complied with this Court's order requiring a jurisdictional supplement #3 . Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to complaint #1 JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF OCTOBER 7, 2021 (Gordon, Brad)
October 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Sunbeam Products, Inc. (lxk, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of Plaintiff's invocation of diversity as the basis for federal jurisdiction, on or before 10/29/21, Plaintiff shall file a jurisdictional supplement as a separate docket entry. Allegations based upon "information and belief" are insufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction in the Seventh Circuit. See Brickstructures, Inc. v. Coaster Dynamix, Inc., 2017 WL 4310671, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Sept. 28, 2017); Ferolie Corp. v. Advantage Sales & Mktg., LLC, No. 04 C 5425, 2004 WL 2433114, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Oct. 28, 2004). In addition, the complaint does not state whether Plaintiff and Defendant are corporations, LLCs, or other type(s) of business association. Plaintiff must correctly identify itself and Defendant and allege the appropriate jurisdictional facts as to each party. For example, a corporation's jurisdictional statement should identify both its state of incorporation and the state in which it maintains its principal place of business. Page v. Democratic Nat'l Comm., 2 F.4th 630, 635 (7th Cir. 2021). An LLC, on the other hand, takes the citizenship of each of its members, so an LLC's jurisdictional statement "must identify the citizenship of each of its members as of the date the complaint or notice of removal was filed, and, if those members have members, the citizenship of those members as well." Thomas v. Guardsmark, LLC, 487 F.3d 531, 534 (7th Cir. 2007). If Plaintiff fails to file the jurisdictional supplement as directed, this case may be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company by Brad Mitchell Gordon (Gordon, Brad)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18744075. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gordon, Brad)
October 6, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Brad Mitchell Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?