United States of America v. Rainey
Plaintiff: Kariem A Rainey and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv05370
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Memorandum in support of section 2255 motion is to be filed by 12/13/2021. Response is to be filed by 1/8/2022. Reply to response is to be filed by 1/22/2022. Telephonic status hearing is set for 1/31/2022 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk)
November 14, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion to appoint counsel #2 and application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 are both granted. Counsel is directed to submit the necessary CJA form for appointment. Counsel will be expected to take the steps necessary to serve the section 2255 motion on the government if that has not already been done. (mk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kariem A Rainey by Steven Shobat Amended Appearance (Shobat, Steven)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Christopher Catizone as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Catizone, Christopher)
October 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (lxk, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kariem A Rainey by Justina Shobat (Shobat, Justina)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shobat, Justina)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kariem A Rainey for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shobat, Justina)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Kariem A Rainey for attorney representation to Appoint Counsel (Shobat, Justina)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate Judgment and Sentence Under Section 2255 filed by Kariem A Rainey; (Shobat, Justina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kariem A Rainey
Represented By: Justina Shobat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Christopher Catizone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?