Morales v. Stateville Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Morales
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center, Illinois Department of Corrections, David Gomez, Jacobs, Williams, Marlene Henze, Americans with Disabilities Act Supervisor, Gerald and Gerald
Case Number: 1:2021cv05536
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Miguel Morales dated 12/4/2021. (Envelope postmark 12/6/2021). (jn, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Miguel Morales for extension of time to file prepay filing fee. (jn, )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Miguel Morales, who is incarcerated at Stateville Correctional Center, filed this lawsuit under 42 U.S.C. 1983, but he did not pay the Court's filing fee or apply for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wants to proceed further, he has until 12/31/2021 to either (1) prepay the $402.00 filing fee; or (2) submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis on the enclosed form along with a copy of his trust fund account statement showing all transactions to his account for the six-month period immediately preceding his initiation of this action. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/3/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
December 3, 2021 MAILED a blank application to proced in forma pauperis and a copy of order dated 12/3/2021 #4 to Miguel Morales (jn, )
November 16, 2021 MAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and Order dated 11/15/2021 to the Plaintiff. (jh, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Miguel Morales, an Illinois prisoner incarcerated at Stateville Correctional Center, initiated this lawsuit under 42 U.S.C. 1983, but he did not pay the Court's filing fee or apply for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wants to proceed further, he has until December 13, 2021 to either (1) prepay the $402.00 filing fee; or (2) submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis on the enclosed form along with a copy of his trust fund account statement showing all transactions to his account for the six-month period immediately preceding his initiation of this action. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/15/2021. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (cp, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Miguel Morales. (cp, )
October 19, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Stateville Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Henze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americans with Disabilities Act Supervisor, Gerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?