Marquez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Marquez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv05565
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sunil R Harjani
Referring Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record #11 is granted. Defendant shall file the administrative record by 2/25/2022. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision is due by 4/26/2022; Defendant's motion to affirm the decision and her brief in support are due by 6/10/2022; and Plaintiff's reply brief is due by 6/24/2022. By 6/24/2022, Defendant shall submit a courtesy copy of the administrative record to Judge Harjani's chambers (Room 1870). Mailed notice (lxs, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hancock, Virginia)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: The following schedule shall govern the proceedings in this case: (1) Defendant shall file the administrative record by 12/27/2021; (2) Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision is due by 2/25/2022; (3) Defendant's motion to affirm the decision and his brief in support are due by 4/11/2022; and (4) Plaintiff's reply brief is due by 4/25/2022. Defendant shall submit a courtesy copy of the administrative record to Judge Harjani's chambers (Room 1870). The parties must include in their briefs a list of the questions presented in support of remand or affirmance. Stating simply that the ALJ's decision is or is not supported by substantial evidence is not sufficient. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week prior to the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice (lxs, )
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 10/27/2021: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs #3 is granted. [For further detail see attached order.] Mailed notice(lxs, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 10/26/21.(nsf, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Olinsky, Howard)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Hancock, Virginia)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rodolfo Marquez by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rodolfo Marquez by Howard D. Olinsky (Olinsky, Howard)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Rodolfo Marquez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Olinsky, Howard)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olinsky, Howard)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rodolfo Marquez; (Olinsky, Howard)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Marquez
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Virginia Ovitz Hancock
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?