Alvarez-Garcia v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Patricia L. Alvarez-Garcia
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv05573
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Beth W Jantz
Referring Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Flannery, Kathleen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jantz. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, within 60 days after the filing of the administrative record, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file a response and brief in support of affirming the decision subject to review. The plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Jantz's standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Jantz's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov Mailed notice. (as, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Beth W. Jantz pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/1/21. (nsf, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff Alvarez-Garcia's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Kathleen Marie Flannery as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Flannery, Kathleen)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Patricia L. Alvarez-Garcia for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia L. Alvarez-Garcia by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia L. Alvarez-Garcia; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
October 20, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez-Garcia v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L. Alvarez-Garcia
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?