Lopez v. Cervantes, et al
Plaintiff: Rosita Lopez
Defendant: C.R. ENGLAND, INC. and Giovany Cervantes
3Rd Party Defendant: Christopher J Lopez
Case Number: 1:2021cv05598
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Christopher J Lopez(Ruebenson, Brittany)
December 15, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Christopher J Lopez by Brittany Nicole Ruebenson (Ruebenson, Brittany)
December 15, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Christopher J Lopez by E. Angelo Spyratos (Spyratos, E.)
November 24, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 1/4/2022. Written discovery requests shall be served by 1/18/2022. Motions to amend the pleadings and add new parties shall be filed by 7/6/2022. Fact discovery (not including treater depositions) shall close 8/31/2022. Plaintiff shall serve Rule 26(a)(2)(C) disclosures by 8/1/2022. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2)(C) witnesses shall be deposed by 10/31/2022. Plaintiff shall serve Rule 26(a)(2)(B) disclosures by 12/2/2022. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) experts shall be deposed by 2/3/2023. Defendants and Third-Party Defendant shall serve Rule 26(a)(2)(B) disclosures by 3/23/2023. Defendants' and Third-Party Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) experts shall be deposed by 5/5/2023. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 10/17/2022. The initial status hearing set for 11/30/2021 is reset for 3/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m. By 2/23/2022, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing: (1) the discovery they have completed; (2) the discovery that remains to be taken; (3) any foreseeable obstacles to meeting the deadlines set forth in this order; (4) whether both sides would like a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge; and (5) whether there is a need for the 3/2/2022 status hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 3/2/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (air, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC., ThirdParty Plaintiff C.R. ENGLAND, INC. regarding status report #21 (Nishimura, Laura)
November 23, 2021 Filing 21 STATUS Report (Initial Joint) by C.R. ENGLAND, INC. (Nishimura, Laura)
October 29, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rosita Lopez by John Wilson Krutulis, Jr (Krutulis, John)
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by C.R. ENGLAND, INC. re third party complaint #18 (Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service) (Linneman, Michael)
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 THIRD party complaint by C.R. ENGLAND, INC. against Christopher J Lopez . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Linneman, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. regarding answer to complaint #16 (Burke, Robert)
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by C.R. ENGLAND, INC.(Burke, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 11/30/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 11/23/2021. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 REFUND PROCESSED re duplicate payment of NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Law Division, $ 402, receipt number 0752-18792033. (Burke, Robert) #3 (sm, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record John W. Krutulis. (jg, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 402.00, receipt no. 0752-18792033, (Burke, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. regarding attorney appearance #10 (Nishimura, Laura)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. by Laura Nishimura (Nishimura, Laura)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. regarding attorney appearance #8 (Gorman, Catherine)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. by Catherine Powers Gorman (Gorman, Catherine)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. regarding attorney appearance #6 (Linneman, Michael)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. by Michael Joseph Linneman (Linneman, Michael)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. regarding civil cover sheet #1 , attorney appearance #2 , jury demand #4 , notice of removal, #3 (Burke, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 JURY Demand (Burke, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Law Division, case number (2021 L 009397) filed by C.R. ENGLAND, INC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18792225. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Burke, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC. by Robert M. Burke (Burke, Robert) Modified on 10/21/2021 (kl, ).
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burke, Robert) Modified on 10/21/2021 (kl, ).
October 21, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Cervantes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosita Lopez
Represented By: John Wilson Krutulis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. ENGLAND, INC.
Represented By: Robert Michael Burke
Represented By: Catherine Powers Gorman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Linneman
Represented By: Laura Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovany Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Christopher J Lopez
Represented By: E. Angelo Spyratos
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Ruebenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?