Blaise v. Transworld Systems Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Blaise
Defendant: Transworld Systems Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05791
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE by Defendant Transworld Systems Inc. to motion to remand #8 (Marcus, Morgan)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion to remand #8 : Defendant's response due by 12/21/2021; Plaintiff's reply due by 1/6/2022. Mailed notice (axc).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Heather Blaise to remand (Kasalo, Mario)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Heather Blaise by Mario Kris Kasalo (Kasalo, Mario)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and affirmative defenses by Transworld Systems Inc.(Marcus, Morgan)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 01/12/2022, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by that date, the removing party's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of notice of removal by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (axc).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Transworld Systems Inc. (Marcus, Morgan)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021CH04867) filed by Transworld Systems Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18821567. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marcus, Morgan)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transworld Systems Inc. by Morgan Ian Marcus (Marcus, Morgan)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transworld Systems Inc. by Andrew E Cunningham (Cunningham, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaise v. Transworld Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Blaise
Represented By: Mario Kris Kasalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Ian Marcus
Represented By: Andrew E Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?