Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.226.255.240
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.226.255.240
Case Number: 1:2021cv05899
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Motion to issue third-party subpoena #6 is granted. Scheduling conference set for 2/17/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearances required). Rule 26(f) planning report due 2/9/2022. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Counsel to note Judge Bucklo's motion call procedures posted on her web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Tallman, Samuel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCfor Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Tallman, Samuel)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (kl, )
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re complaint #1 (Tallman, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Samuel J. Tallman (Tallman, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tallman, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18840809.(Tallman, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.226.255.240
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Samuel J. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.226.255.240
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?