Starnes v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Angie D. Starnes
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv05978
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Referring Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Kelly, Kathryn)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Kelly, Kathryn)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #7 is granted. The Court finds that Plaintiff is unable to pay the costs and fees associated with filing this action and thus the filing fee is waived. This matter is before the Court for review of a final decision by the Commissioner of Social Security. The parties should consult with each other by 11/24/2021 to determine whether they will consent to the reassignment of this case to the magistrate judge for all further proceedings. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, they should file a joint statement of consent pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(a). Otherwise, pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review within 60 days after the filing of the answer to the complaint and/or the administrative record. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file its motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 11/9/2021. (exr, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction regarding #1 , #2 , #3 (exr, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Angie D. Starnes for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Angie D. Starnes by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Angie D. Starnes; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR (exr, ).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR (exr, ).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ENTERED IN ERROR (exr)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgement, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starnes v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie D. Starnes
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?